NH HB1648 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring prosecution of a law enforcement officer for failure to enforce the crime of interference with custody.
Title
Requiring prosecution of a law enforcement officer for failure to enforce the crime of interference with custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.856 | |
2012-01-26 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 6, PG.291 | |
2012-01-26 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 8 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 6, PG.291 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-12-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG.363 |