NH HB169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the removal of unused utility poles following the transition of equipment, lines, and cables to new utility poles.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the removal of unused utility poles following the transition of equipment, lines, and cables to new utility poles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-06-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92874903669 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Vacated and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 01/06/2021 House Journal 2 P. 50 |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 37 |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304