NH HB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the net operating loss carryover under the business profits tax.
Title
Increasing the net operating loss carryover under the business profits tax.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cebrowski [R] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
Rep. William Smith [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Timothy Twombly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-10-03 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/26/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-08-04 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-06-02 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-24 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.826 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |