NH HB350 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting discrimination against the unemployed.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against the unemployed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2349h for Jan 8 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2013-11-06 | House | =RESCHEDULED=Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-10-28 | House | =CANCELLED=Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/14/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-10-21 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-05-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.192 |