NH HB396 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting classification of individuals based on biological sex under certain limited circumstances.
Title
Permitting classification of individuals based on biological sex under certain limited circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 184 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 194 N: 182 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 184 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 194 N: 182 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024 |
2024-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reconsider HB396 (Rep. M. Cahill): Motion Failed DV 187-190 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 14 |
2024-01-08 | House | Notice of Reconsideration (Rep. M. Cahill) 01/04/2024 |
2024-01-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0441h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-184 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 23 |
2024-01-04 | House | Amendment # 2023-0441h (NT): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 194-182 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 21 |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 41 |
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 37 |
2023-05-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Carry Over) 2023-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)