NH HB489 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0293; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2014. Remainder Effective 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0293; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2014. Remainder Effective 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the New Hampshire medical malpractice joint underwriting association and clarifying the procedure to be followed for certain funds held by the association.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the New Hampshire medical malpractice joint underwriting association and clarifying the procedure to be followed for certain funds held by the association.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Signed by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0293; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2014. Remainder Effective 8/1/2014. |
2014-06-25 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled (6/4/14) |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2021eba, (NT) Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2021e New Title, Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1940c, Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1940c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1940c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 11:00 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Reagan, and Watters |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Butler, Harding, Schlachman, John Hunt |
2014-04-23 | House | Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep. Butler) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0111s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0111s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0111s, New Title, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0670h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.740-742 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0670h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.740-742 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0670h; House Calendar 22, PG.550-551 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0670h for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.501 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.197 |