NH HB558 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15
Summary
Establishing a procedure for leasing state parks.
Title
Establishing a procedure for leasing state parks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Hearing: April 6, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 11, Pg.260 | |
2010-03-24 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0878h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 233-106; House Journal 30, PG.1484 | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment #0878h (Rep Swinford) Adopted, Division Vote 293-42; House Journal 30, PG.1484 | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for March 24 (Vote 10-6;Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.1226-1227 | |
2010-03-10 | House Executive Session: 3/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Continued 3/17/10 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Necessary) | |
2010-02-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/2/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-02-10 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 16, PG.765 | |
2010-02-10 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0417h (New Title): Motion Adopted 213-141; House Journal 16, PG.761-765 | |
2010-02-10 | House Recommit (Rep Baldasaro): Motion Failed Division Vote 127-225; House Journal 16, PG.763 | |
2010-02-10 | House Amendment #0417h (New Title) Adopted, Division Vote 230-53; House Journal 16, PG.762-763 | |
2010-02-03 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0417h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.555-557 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0417h (New Title) for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (vote 14-4); House Calendar 13, PG.540 | |
2010-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/28/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 (Continued 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 If Necessary) | |
2010-01-20 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-01-13 | House Recommit (Rep Spang): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 172-158; House Journal 9, PG.430-432 | |
2010-01-13 | House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Chandler); House Journal 9, PG.430 | |
2010-01-13 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2010-0011h (New Title): Motion Failed Division Vote 157-171; House Journal 9, PG.421-430 | |
2010-01-13 | House Lay on the Table (Rep Renzullo): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 154-173; House Journal 9, PG.428-430 | |
2010-01-13 | House Floor Amendment #2010-0139h (New Title) (Rep Bolster) Failed, Regular Calendar 93-236; House Journal 9, PG.423-428 | |
2010-01-13 | House Divide Floor Amendment #2010-0139h (NT) (Rep Spaulding); House Journal 9, PG.426 | |
2010-01-13 | House Floor Amendment #2010-0139h (New Title) (Rep Bolster); House Journal 9, PG.423-425 | |
2010-01-13 | House Amendment #2010-0011h (New Title) Adopted, Division Vote 144-127; House Journal 9, PG.421-423 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-25 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 2, PG.98 | |
2009-11-25 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2010-0011h (New Title); House Calendar 1, PG.24-26 | |
2009-11-25 | House Majority Committee Rept: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2010-0011h (NT) for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 11-7); House Calendar2, PG.98 | |
2009-11-02 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/24/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/4/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-10-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/26/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-10-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 =ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 305)= | |
2009-09-30 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2009 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-09-30 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-09-30 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/30/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/22/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-02-26 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-02-11 | House Executive Session: 2/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-02-04 | House Public Hearing: 2/12/2009 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=765&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |