NH HB558 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a clean water tax credit.
Title
Establishing a clean water tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 570 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 354 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 230 |