NH HB558 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 230-99 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 230-99 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting private and for-profit prison contracts, and relative to immigration detention facilities.
Title
Prohibiting private and for-profit prison contracts, and relative to immigration detention facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 230-99 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2017-02-09 | House | Special Order to regular calendar on 2/15/2017 Without Objection House Journal 6 P. 25 |
2017-02-09 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Horrigan) 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 12-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 3 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 18 |