NH HB607 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-22 - House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-22 - House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302
Summary
Relative to residential pharmaceutical waste.
Title
Relative to residential pharmaceutical waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-22 | House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-06-23 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/30/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-06-14 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-06-14 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/23/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-06-09 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/15/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-05-04 | House Members: Reps Nevins, Schlachman & R.Holden | |
2010-05-04 | House ==CANCELLED==Interim Study Subcom Work Sess: 6/9/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =DATE CHANGE (Orig 5/28/2010)= | |
2010-05-04 | House Interim Study Subcom Work Sess: 5/21/2010 1:00PM Legislative Office Building 302 Members: Reps Nevins, Schlachman & R.Holden | |
2010-05-04 | House Interim Study Subcom Work Sess: 5/7/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 Members: Reps Nevins, Schlachman & R.Holden | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-06 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.251 | |
2009-11-24 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 2, PG.79 | |
2009-10-28 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/12/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00AM)== | |
2009-10-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/10/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-10-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/4/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-10-01 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/28/2009 Legislative Office Building 302 1:00 PM | |
2009-10-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-10-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-09-30 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-09-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-09-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-02-26 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-02-11 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/17/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-02-10 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-01-29 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=528&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |