NH HB608 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2358h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2358h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the slaughter of poultry and rabbits.
Title
Relative to the slaughter of poultry and rabbits.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Guy Comtois [R] |
Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2358h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-23 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00pm or immediately following House session Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-10-03 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-09-04 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-08-14 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/3/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-05-30 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/13/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-04-11 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG.202 |