NH HB68 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study reducing the rate of the interest and dividends tax for New Hampshire residents over 65 years of age.
Title
Establishing a committee to study reducing the rate of the interest and dividends tax for New Hampshire residents over 65 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361 | |
2011-02-08 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.233 | |
2011-02-01 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 8, PG.129 |