NH SB382 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to election recounts and audits.
Title
Relative to election recounts and audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/05/2024; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |