NH SB391 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 391 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 391 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the juvenile justice advisory board; the policies and procedures of the youth development center; and a reduction in appropriation to the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Title
Relative to the juvenile justice advisory board; the policies and procedures of the youth development center; and a reduction in appropriation to the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Gene Charron [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] |
Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-15 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 391 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 16 |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/28/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2000c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #2000c, Adopted Div 334-11 |
2014-05-30 | House | Conference Committee Report #2014-2000c; House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-27 | Senate | C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === 5/29/2013, 2:30 p.m., Room 100, State House |
2014-05-27 | Senate | C of C Meeting: == RECESSED === 5/27/2013, 2:00 p.m., Room 100, State House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014, 2:00 p.m., Room 100, State House |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Walz, Long, Gargasz, Huot |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to accede to request for C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Boutin, and Soucy |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1655h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1655h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment #2014-1655h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1655h (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-29 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-29 | House | Continued Division III Work Session: 5/1/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-24 | House | Division III Work Session: 4/29/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 =RECESSED= |
2014-04-23 | House | Refer to Finance |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1421h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | House | Amendment #1421h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1421h (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-15 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/14 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 Immediatley following House session Legislative Office Building 206 Legislative Office Building |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/15/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-04-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/10/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Children and Family Law |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1121s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1121s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1121s, New Title, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing:===RESCHEDULED=== 3/12/14, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing:===CANCELLED=== 2/19/14, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |