NH SB392 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0209; Effective 07/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0209; Effective 07/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission on rural affairs.
Title
Establishing a commission on rural affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0209; Effective 07/11/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Concurs with House Amendment #1500h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep. Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1500h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment #2014-1500h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1500h (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-16 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-09 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 4/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== |
2014-04-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive session: 4/15/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0556s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0556s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0556s, New Title, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |