NH SB394 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0181; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0181; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal history record checks of nursing home administrators.
Title
Relative to criminal history record checks of nursing home administrators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0181; Effective 01/01/2017 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 13 |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 8 |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |