NH SB397 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of wines from Argentina.
Title
Relative to the sale of wines from Argentina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Sen. Reagan offered to Refer to Interim Study |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed, Voice Vote |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/6/14; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: ===RESCHEDULED===2/19/14, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: ===CANCELLED===3/5/14, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: ===CANCELLED=== 2/5/14, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |