NH SB403 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the exemption for recreational vehicles from property taxation.
Title
Relative to the exemption for recreational vehicles from property taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 10 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/19/2018 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1012s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1012s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1012s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |