NH SB404 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 355; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 355; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expanding child care professionals' eligibility for the child care scholarship program.
Title
Relative to expanding child care professionals' eligibility for the child care scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 355; Effective 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2352e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2352e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1921h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 73 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1921h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 73 |
2024-05-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1921h 05/15/2024 (Vote 23-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 19 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Division III Work Session: 05/10/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Division III Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 21 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1571h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 20 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1571h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 19 |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1571h 04/24/2024 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 13 |
2024-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-04-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-04-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare House Journal 10 P. 228 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1344s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1344s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1344s, 04/05/2024, Vote 6-0; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0566s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0566s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0566s, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |