NH SB422 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0150; Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0150; Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of pharmacy benefit manager.
Title
Relative to the definition of pharmacy benefit manager.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0150; Effective 08/15/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1069s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1069s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1069s, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Hearing: 3/4/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |