NH SB440 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Lay SB440 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 224-137 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Lay SB440 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 224-137 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the board of optometry and the regulation of optometry.
Title
Relative to the board of optometry and the regulation of optometry.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Lay SB440 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 224-137 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 55 |
2024-05-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2024-05-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1815h 05/08/2024 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 16 |
2024-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 103 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0397s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0397s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0397s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |