NH SB449 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0294; Effective 09/24/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0294; Effective 09/24/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the permit issuance timeline for state air permits and the department of environmental services duty to make annual reports.
Title
Relative to the permit issuance timeline for state air permits and the department of environmental services duty to make annual reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0294; Effective 09/24/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1565h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 83 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1565h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 82 |
2024-04-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-04-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1565h (NT) 04/22/2024 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 26 |
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/22/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/15/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 227 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1120s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1120s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1120s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |