NH SB466 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - II. Remainder Effective 06/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - II. Remainder Effective 06/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the detention of youthful offenders at the youth development center.
Title
Relative to the detention of youthful offenders at the youth development center.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2088c (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 141 N: 200 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 141 N: 200 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | I. Sections 1-3 Effective 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0303 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2152e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2152e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 62 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2088c; Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Adopted; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2088c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 24 |
2016-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2088c Filed 05/26/2016; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator D'Allesandro |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/25/2016, 02:00 pm, Room 103, State House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 03:15 pm, Room 103, State House==RECESSED== |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Gargasz, Kurk, Barry, Berrien 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Gargasz, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Little, D'Allesandro; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1824h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1824h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 83 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1845h (Rep. Rogers): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 141-200 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 79 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1824h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 77 |
2016-05-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1845h [^] House Calendar 29 P. 22 |
2016-05-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1824h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 25-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 22 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 05/03/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-28 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-1661h: 05/03/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-27 | House | ==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 04/27/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 04/26/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Finance 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 44 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1345h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 43 |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment #2016-1345h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 43 |
2016-04-20 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. L. Ober) 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 2 |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1345h (NT) for 04/20/2016 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 6 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |