NH SB497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0298; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0298; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing the disproportionate share hospital fund.
Title
Relative to establishing the disproportionate share hospital fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0298; Effective 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1294h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1294h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 9 |
2024-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1294h 03/26/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/26/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 03/11/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |