NH SB552 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to application of the Internal Revenue Code to provisions of the business profits tax.
Title
Relative to application of the Internal Revenue Code to provisions of the business profits tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Russell Prescott [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-08-18 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-04-20 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 10 |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/20/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 12 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-04-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/12/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1155s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-1155s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Special Order SB 552 to After Lunch, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with AmendmentS 0466s, and 0478s, New Title, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-0478s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0466s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/18/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0466s, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing: 02/09/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |