NH SB556 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0306; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0306; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting health carriers from establishing payment or reimbursement provisions based solely on a participating advanced practice registered nurse's licensure.
Title
Prohibiting health carriers from establishing payment or reimbursement provisions based solely on a participating advanced practice registered nurse's licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0306; Effective 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1785h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1785h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1785h (NT) 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 8 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 05/01/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 103 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1475s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2024-1475s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 14A |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1264s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1264s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1264s, 04/05/2024, Vote 4-1; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |