NH SB572 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the individual health insurance market.
Title
Relative to the individual health insurance market.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |