NH SB585 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0310; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0310; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a property lien resulting from unpaid meals and rooms taxes.
Title
Relative to a property lien resulting from unpaid meals and rooms taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Rep. Jason Osborne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0310; Effective 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Lang Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1796h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 41 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1796h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 41 |
2024-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1796h 05/07/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 14 |
2024-04-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/23/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/09/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-1; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |