NH SB647 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to telemedicine and substance use disorder.
Title
Relative to telemedicine and substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2020-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0609s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0609s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0609s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6A |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:40 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |