NJ A1068 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S2562 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S2562 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets confidentiality standards for public employee assistance program records; prohibits employer actions against program participants.
Title
Sets confidentiality standards for public employee assistance program records; prohibits employer actions against program participants.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Rep. Jason O'Donnell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Substituted by S2562 (2R) | |
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2562 (Same As) 2011-05-09 - Approved P.L.2011, c.69.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A1068 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1500/1068_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1500/1068_R1.HTM |