NJ S2562 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved P.L.2011, c.69.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved P.L.2011, c.69.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sets confidentiality standards for public employee assistance program records; prohibits employer actions against program participants.
Title
Sets confidentiality standards for public employee assistance program records; prohibits employer actions against program participants.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Rep. Jason O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Approved P.L.2011, c.69. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Substituted for A1068 (2R) | |
2011-03-14 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) | |
2011-02-22 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1068 (Same As) 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S2562 (2R)