NJ A1079 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5955
Note: Carry Over of previous S4192
Note: Carry Over of previous S4192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care professionals to undergo explicit and implicit bias training.
Title
Requires certain health care professionals to undergo explicit and implicit bias training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S703 (3R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5955 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S703 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.79.
S4192 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S703 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.79.
S4192 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee