NJ A112 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A231
Note: Carry Over of previous A225
Note: Carry Over of previous A225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes uniform rates for water and sewer services for residential use based exclusively on metered consumption.
Title
Establishes uniform rates for water and sewer services for residential use based exclusively on metered consumption.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] |
Rep. Matthew Milam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A112 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A225 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2655 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A225 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2655 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A112 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/112_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A112 |