NJ A1122 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Domestic Violence Tuition Waiver Program."
Title
Establishes the "Domestic Violence Tuition Waiver Program."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2243 (Same As) 2012-10-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A1122 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1500/1122_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1500/1122_R1.HTM |