NJ A1227 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S654
Note: Carry Over of previous A442
Note: Carry Over of previous S618
Note: Carry Over of previous A442
Note: Carry Over of previous S618
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a joint legislative and executive branch New Jersey Revenue Advisory Board to provide consensus revenue forecasting advice for State budget purposes.
Title
Establishes a joint legislative and executive branch New Jersey Revenue Advisory Board to provide consensus revenue forecasting advice for State budget purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1227 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A442 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S1530 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S618 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A442 (2R)
A442 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S1530 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S618 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A442 (2R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1227 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1227_I1.HTM |