NJ S654 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3248
Note: Carry Over of previous S1530
Note: Carry Over of previous A1227
Note: Carry Over of previous S821
Note: Carry Over of previous A3516
Note: Carry Over of previous S1530
Note: Carry Over of previous A1227
Note: Carry Over of previous S821
Note: Carry Over of previous A3516
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Revenue Advisory Board; modifies executive State budget presentation; updates State revenue and expenditure reporting and disclosure requirements; and requires annual State financial stress testing.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Revenue Advisory Board; modifies executive State budget presentation; updates State revenue and expenditure reporting and disclosure requirements; and requires annual State financial stress testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S654 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1530 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1227 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A5779 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S821 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3516 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1530 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1227 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A5779 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S821 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3516 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S654 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/654_I1.HTM |