NJ A1306 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1324
Note: Carry Foward to future S1988
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Note: Carry Over of previous S2123
Note: Carry Foward to future S1988
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Note: Carry Over of previous S2123
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for background checks and other requirements for certain agencies providing temporary home for child or pregnant woman during crisis.
Title
Provides for background checks and other requirements for certain agencies providing temporary home for child or pregnant woman during crisis.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Rep. Aura Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1306 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A1306 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A403 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1890 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2123 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1306 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A403 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1890 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2123 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1306 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1306_I1.HTM |