NJ S1890 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1324
Note: Carry Foward to future S764
Note: Carry Over of previous S2123
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Note: Carry Foward to future S764
Note: Carry Over of previous S2123
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for background checks and other requirements for certain agencies providing temporary home for child or pregnant woman during crisis.
Title
Provides for background checks and other requirements for certain agencies providing temporary home for child or pregnant woman during crisis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1890 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1890 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1306 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2123 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A403 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1890 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1306 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2123 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A403 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1890 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1890_I1.HTM |