NJ A1596 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A741
Note: Carry Over of previous A3304
Note: Carry Over of previous S1451
Note: Carry Over of previous A3304
Note: Carry Over of previous S1451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires explosive gas detectors to be installed in certain residential properties.
Title
Requires explosive gas detectors to be installed in certain residential properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1596 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3304 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1451 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S852 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3304 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1451 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S852 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1596 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2000/1596_I1.HTM |