NJ A1659 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4293
Note: Carry Over of previous A3850
Note: Carry Over of previous S2144
Note: Carry Over of previous A3850
Note: Carry Over of previous S2144
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1559 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1559 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Insurance Fair Conduct Act."
Title
"New Jersey Insurance Fair Conduct Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S1559 (3R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4293 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1559 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.388.
A3850 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2144 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1559 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.388.
A3850 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2144 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading