NJ A1783 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.199.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.199.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Art Therapist Licensing Act."
Title
"Art Therapist Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2020 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2020 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.199. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (57-8-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-10) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2020 (1R) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (60-11-7) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway) |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2020 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A1783 (2R)