NJ S2020 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A1783 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A1783 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Art Therapist Licensing Act."
Title
"Art Therapist Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A1783 (2R) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1783 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.199.