NJ A1887 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1138
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1887 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2623
S655 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2623
S655 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee