NJ S655 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S840
Note: Carry Over of previous S2623
Note: Carry Over of previous S2623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S655 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2623 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1887 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2623 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1887 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S655 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/655_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S655 |