NJ S2623 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4849 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-24-3) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4849 |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2623 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4849 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2623
A4849 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2623