NJ A1918 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2246
Note: Carry Over of previous A4220
Note: Carry Over of previous A4220
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.
Title
Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3596 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3596 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted for S3596 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1918 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3596 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A1918 (2R)
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3596 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A1918 (2R)