NJ A4220 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1918
Note: Carry Foward to future S3596
Note: Carry Foward to future S3596
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.*
Title
Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee