NJ A1975 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S666
Note: Carry Over of previous A5926
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Note: Carry Over of previous A5926
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Virtual Currency and Blockchain Regulation Act."
Title
"Virtual Currency and Blockchain Regulation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-23-5) |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1975 (Carry Over) 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5926 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4163 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1267 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5926 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4163 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1267 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee