NJ S1267 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S666
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Note: Carry Over of previous A5926
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Note: Carry Over of previous A5926
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Virtual Currency and Blockchain Regulation Act."
Title
"Virtual Currency and Blockchain Regulation Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1267 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1975 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S4163 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5926 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1975 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S4163 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5926 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1267 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1267_I1.HTM |