NJ A2199 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3627
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes veterans' preference for affordable housing in certain housing projects.
Title
Establishes veterans' preference for affordable housing in certain housing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S744 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.19. |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S744 (1R) |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3627 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S744 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A2199 (1R)
S744 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A2199 (1R)